FL S1074 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the rulemaking authority and responsibilities of the State Fire Marshal relating to educational and ancillary plants. Requires the State Fire Marshal and the Florida Building Code Administrators and Inspectors Board to enter into a reciprocity agreement to recognize certain continuing education recertification hours for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Firesafety [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176) | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Higher Education -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-14 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00606 | |
2010-04-09 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/10, 9:30 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00269; Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/17/10, 8:00 am, 301-S | |
2010-03-11 | Now in Education Pre-K - 12 -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/10/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; Education Pre-K - 12; Community Affairs; Higher Education; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00076 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Education Pre-K - 12; Community Affairs; Higher Education; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0401 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173)
H0663 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-176; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0648 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01005; Amendment(s) adopted (772328, 404418, 337832, 298178, 169094) -SJ 01007; Substituted CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 -SJ 01007; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 01007
S0832 (Similar To) 2010-04-08 - Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00522; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173) -SJ 00522
H0531 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
H0663 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-176; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174)
S0648 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01005; Amendment(s) adopted (772328, 404418, 337832, 298178, 169094) -SJ 01007; Substituted CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 -SJ 01007; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/CS/HB 713 (Ch. 2010-106), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2010-110), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2010-99), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173), CS/CS/CS/SB 1196 (Ch. 2010-174) -SJ 01007
S0832 (Similar To) 2010-04-08 - Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00522; Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), SB 1136 (Ch. 2010-173) -SJ 00522
H0531 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0633 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0633 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0633 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |