FL S1044 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 931
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 931
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing school districts and charter schools to adopt a policy to allow volunteer school chaplains; requiring district school boards and charter school governing boards to assign specified duties to such volunteer school chaplains; requiring school districts that adopt volunteer school chaplain policies to publish certain information on their websites; providing background screening requirements for volunteer school chaplains, etc.
Title
School Chaplains
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Education (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Education (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 931 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Substituted HB 931 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 02/20/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Education; Rules |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H931 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - Chapter No. 2024-103
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |