FL S1012 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 141
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 141
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting a law enforcement officer from paying a toll on a toll facility when operating a marked or unmarked official vehicle while on official law enforcement business; requiring fees generated from tolls to be used to reimburse, by interlocal agreement within a specified timeframe, a county or another local governmental entity for the direct actual costs of operating a specified fire station; requiring the governing body of the authority in certain counties to, by a specified date, submit to the Governor information regarding its compliance with a specified minimum percent toll reduction, etc.
Title
Toll Operations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 141 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 141 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (601792, 868498) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H141 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-145
S336 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S356 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S336 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S356 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
338 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |