FL S0336 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting a law enforcement officer operating an official vehicle, rather than only a marked official vehicle, while on official law enforcement business from paying the toll at a toll facility, etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H141 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-145
S356 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S818 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H649 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S1012 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 141
S356 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S818 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H649 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S1012 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 141
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/336 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/336/BillText/Filed/HTML |