FL H0141 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revising provisions relating to contracting and negotiation between the Department of Transportation and local governmental entities for acquisition, construction, or operation of turnpike projects; exempting a law enforcement officer from paying a toll on a toll facility when operating an official vehicle while on official law enforcement business; requiring fees generated from tolls to be used to reimburse, by interlocal agreement, a county or another local governmental entity for the direct actual costs of operating a specified fire station providing services to the public on Alligator Alley, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#802 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-145
2018-04-06 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 2
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1012
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-03-07SenateReceived
2018-03-07SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (157309, 641215)
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time 898
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseAmendment(s) adopted (450325, 799337)
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time 833
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-28HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-16HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-09HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-12-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-12-06HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2017-09-19HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-09-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S336 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S356 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S818 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H649 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S1012 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 141
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
338155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33826Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3480003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348004Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/Amendment/084135/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/Amendment/799337/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/Amendment/450325/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/Vote/HouseVote_h00141e1802.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/141/Vote/SenateVote_h00141e2050.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback