FL S0974 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides circumstances under which a candidate without opposition due to a specified vacancy in candidacy shall be declared elected to office without having to reopen the qualifying period and hold a municipal special election.
Title
Municipal Elections [GPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Governmental Operations -SJ 00070 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Policy & Steering Committee on Governmental Operations | |
2009-12-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0385 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)