FL H0385 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides circumstances under which candidate without opposition due to specified vacancy in candidacy shall be declared elected to office without having to reopen qualifying period & hold municipal special election.
Title
Municipal Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Ari Porth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00038 | |
2009-12-18 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-11-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0974 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections