FL S0942 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that certain information retained by the Criminal Justice Information Program relating to juvenile offenders is exempt from public records requirements; deleting exceptions from an exemption from public records requirements for certain information relating to juvenile offenders; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Juvenile Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1395 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/942 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0942/BillText/Filed/HTML |