FL S0920 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/18/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 1:30 pm in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to adopt rules for an electric vehicle transportation electrification plan that meet certain requirements; providing timeframes for the commission to propose the plan's rules and for final rule adoption; authorizing entities that provide electric vehicle charging stations to the public to intervene and participate in certain commission proceedings involving rates, terms, or conditions for offering electric vehicle charging to the public, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Vehicle Transportation Electrification Plan

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/18/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-30SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Transportation; Rules
2021-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H737 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
366945Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback