FL H0737 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires PSC to adopt rules for electric vehicle transportation electrification plan; provides timeframes for such rules & for final rule adoption; authorizes entities that provide electric vehicle charging stations to public to intervene & participate in commission proceedings involving rates, terms, or conditions of service for offering electric vehicle charging to public.
Title
Electric Vehicle Transportation Electrification Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Original reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-11 | House | PCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-13 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-13 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S920 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation