FL S0916 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting the fee-for-service option as a basis for the reimbursement of Medicaid provider service networks; requiring, rather than authorizing, provider service networks to be prepaid plans; revising the number of eligible Medicaid health care plans the agency must procure for certain regions in the state, etc.
Title
Statewide Medicaid Managed Care Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substituted HB 7117 (Died in House returning Messages) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/17 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS by Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/13/17, 2:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0682 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
H7117 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
H7117 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 978 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |