FL S0914 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that, for certain attorney fees awarded for claims arising under property insurance policies, a strong presumption is created that a lodestar fee is sufficient and reasonable; providing that such presumption may be rebutted only under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Contingency Risk Multipliers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7071 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance