FL S0914 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the Educational Dollars for Duty program; revising the ineligibility criteria for members of the Florida National Guard; providing that guard members who have earned certain college degrees before becoming a guard member are eligible for the program, etc.
Title
Educational Dollars for Duty Program
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H345 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/914 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/914/BillText/Filed/HTML |