FL S0870 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Human Trafficking Prevention Act (HTPA)"; prohibiting covered businesses from manufacturing, distributing, or selling certain devices unless the devices contain an active and operating filter that blocks Internet access to specified types of sexually oriented material, prostitution, assignation, lewdness, and human trafficking; providing requirements for a consumer to have such filter deactivated; requiring a filter deactivation fee and providing for the collection and distribution thereof, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Access

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2017-02-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0337 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470143Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback