FL H0337 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits covered businesses from manufacturing, distributing, or selling certain devices unless device contains active & operating filter that blocks Internet access to specified types of sexually oriented material, prostitution, assignation, lewdness, & human trafficking; provides for injunctive relief for violations; provides requirements for consumer to have such filter deactivated; requires filter deactivation fee & provides for collection & distribution thereof; prohibits distribution or sale of certain devices without filters to minors & adults; requires covered businesses to respond to reports of obscene material that has breached filter; requires covered businesses to unblock nonobscene material; exempts certain websites from filtering; authorizing Office of Statewide Prosecution to prosecute violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Access

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Commerce Committee
2017-01-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0870 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8470143Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback