FL S0862 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to publish Gold Seal designations in the Nursing Home Guide; requiring each nursing home facility to post a sign on every facility entrance which indicates the Gold Seal designation of the facility; requiring a nursing home facility on the Nursing Home Guide Watch List to provide notice containing certain information to the primary familial contact for each resident, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing Home Guides

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Health Policy
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-20SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1061 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40023Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback