FL H1061 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires AHCA to publish Gold Seal designations in Nursing Home Guide; requires nursing home facility to post Gold Seal designation signs; requires nursing home on Nursing Home Guide Watch List to provide notice containing certain information to primary familial contact for each resident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing Home Guides

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Health Innovation Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0862 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40023Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback