FL S0858 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Sofia Taddeo-Goldstein Act"; specifying that only school principals, and not teachers, may administer corporal punishment to public school students; requiring school principals to notify students' parents in writing and receive written consent before administering corporal punishment; authorizing teachers and other instructional personnel to request that principals administer corporal punishment; prohibiting principals from administering corporal punishment unless they have taken specified actions, etc.
Title
Corporal Punishment in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/858 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/858/BillText/Filed/HTML |