FL S0858 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term "fractional aircraft ownership program." Provides tax exemptions on the sale or use of aircraft primarily used in a fractional aircraft ownership program and for the parts and labor used in the maintenance, repair, and overhaul of such aircraft. Provides a maximum tax on the sale or use of fractional aircraft ownership interests.
Title
Sales Tax/Fractional Aircraft Ownership Program [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) | |
2010-04-14 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-12 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00552; On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 301-S | |
2010-04-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by Commerce; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 -SJ 00552; CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -SJ 00555 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00061 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Commerce; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-12-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0913 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147)
S1752 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-147; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2010-128), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/HB 7205 (Ch. 2010-140), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208)
S1752 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-147; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2010-128), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/HB 7205 (Ch. 2010-140), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0212 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 0597 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |