FL S0856 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing private provider inspections of onsite sewage treatment and disposal systems under certain conditions; prohibiting the Department of Environmental Protection from charging certain inspection and permit fees; specifying requirements for private providers and onsite sewage treatment and disposal system owners and authorized contractors; revising the list of providers authorized to perform onsite sewage treatment and disposal system evaluations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Provider Inspections of Onsite Sewage Treatment and Disposal Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14SenateNow in Appropriations
2022-01-12SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/12/22, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-12-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2021-11-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-11-30SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2021-11-16SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2021-11-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H309 (Same As) 2022-01-13 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38100651Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/Amendment/151510/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/Analyses/2022s00856.pre.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/Analyses/2022s00856.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/Analyses/2022s00856.pre.aeg.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/Analyses/2022s00856.aeg.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/Vote/2021-11-30%200900AM~S00856%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/856/Vote/2022-01-12%200430PM~S00856%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback