FL S0826 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring certain lien notices be sent through a third-party notification service; revising requirements for the inspection and release of vehicles or vessels and personal property in such vehicles or vessels; requiring third-party notification services to apply to the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles for approval, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Towing-storage Operator Liens

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateFavorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-21SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-03-20SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2019-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-18SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Judiciary; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H347 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H431 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
71378Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback