FL H0431 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes person claiming lien against motor vehicle to obtain release of vehicle from lien claimed by motor vehicle repair shop; prohibits repair shop from violating certain provisions; revises notice requirements for enforcing lien by sale of motor vehicle; revises requirements for notice of lien & notice of sale; requires lienor to make motor vehicle available for inspection; revises requirements for transfer of title; authorizes lienor to charge administrative fee; revises requirements for notice of lien for recovering, towing, or storing vehicle or vessel; revises requirements for notice of sale; revises requirements for transfer of title; requires certain entities to use third-party service to provide notices.
Title
Liens Against Motor Vehicles and Vessels
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#165 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#137 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#165 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#137 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-73 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-30 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-30 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 772 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Was taken up |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (214153) |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-03 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-27 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-11 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-11 | House | Now in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2019-03-08 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-06 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S772 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73)
H347 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73)
S826 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73)
H347 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73)
S826 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 920 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |