FL S0800 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing municipalities to exempt by ordinance the public service tax that specified users would pay on energy purchases; providing an exemption from the state tax on sales, use, and other transactions for building materials used in the rehabilitation of real property in an opportunity zone; revising the matching requirement for grant funds received by a regional economic development organization; establishing a rural opportunity tax refund program for qualified target industry businesses in rural areas, etc.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H685 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
166 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |