FL S0798 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting a prohibition against certain Florida College System institutions participating in intercollegiate athletics beyond the 2-year level; authorizing Florida College System institutions to participate in intercollegiate athletics at the 4-year level, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baccalaureate Degree Access

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-02SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-04-02SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H789 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100733Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback