FL S0784 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the conditional medical release program within the Department of Corrections for specified purposes; authorizing certain inmates be released on conditional medical release before serving 85 percent of their term of imprisonment; requiring that inmates who meet certain criteria be considered for conditional medical release; specifying that inmates do not have a right to conditional medical release or to a certain medical evaluation; providing that inmates are considered medical releasees upon release from the department into the community, etc.
Title
Inmate Conditional Medical Release
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S782 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 1935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 0911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/784 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/784/BillText/Filed/HTML |