FL S0780 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a financial institution that institutes a foreclosure proceeding against residential property to pay all fees associated with or owed by the property which accrue from the date the foreclosure action is initiated until the foreclosure is finalized. Provides for retroactive application.
Title
Foreclosure Proceedings/Payment of Fees [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00056 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-11-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0987 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)