FL S0760 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "coercion"; prohibiting facilitating or enabling the receiving of persons in any place, structure, building, or conveyance for the purpose of prostitution, lewdness, or assignation, or facilitating or enabling any person to remain there for such purpose; providing that a person may not procure, facilitate, or entice another to engage in prostitution for specified purposes; providing increased criminal penalties for specified prohibited acts relating to prostitution, lewdness, or assignation; deleting provisions relating to the reclassification of penalties if a massage establishment is used for lewdness, assignation, or prostitution, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H521 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0433 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |