FL H0521 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of term "coercion"; provides criminal penalties for engaging in human trafficking or benefiting financially by receiving value from human trafficking using labor or services or commercial sexual activity of an adult; prohibits facilitating or enabling receiving of persons for purpose of prostitution, lewdness, or assignation, or facilitating or enabling any person to remain there for such purposes; provides increased criminal penalties for specified prohibited acts relating to prostitution, lewdness, or assignation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking and Prostitution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-11-19HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-19HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S760 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430433Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback