FL S0750 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the combined total amount of research and development credits against the corporate income tax which may be granted to certain business enterprises during any calendar year, etc.
Title
Research and Development Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |