FL S0742 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "covered policy" under the Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund in relation to certain collateral protection insurance policies; authorizing any association, trust, or pool created for the purpose of forming or managing a risk management mechanism or providing self-insurance for a public entity to establish a quorum and conduct public business through communication media technology; specifying the entities that must receive requests for loss run statements; providing a ratemaking factor for workers' compensation and employer's liability insurance, etc.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-16 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H815 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
S1408 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
H1209 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-113
S1408 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
H1209 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-113
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 46227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 856 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0629 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 444 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6647 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |