FL S0742 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "health care provider"; providing for the reclassification of certain assault and battery offenses committed on health care providers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault or Battery on Health Care Providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations; Rules
2017-11-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H101 (Same As) 2017-10-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S490 (Similar To) 2017-10-13 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7750877Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
938085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985644Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback