FL S0490 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for offense reclassification if a person is charged with knowingly committing an assault or a battery upon a health care provider, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-13SenateWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-10-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H101 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S742 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750877Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
938085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985644Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback