FL S0734 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to provide grants to coastal counties for saltwater intrusion vulnerability assessments; requiring the department to update the comprehensive statewide flood vulnerability and sea level rise data set and make certain information received from the saltwater intrusion vulnerability assessments available on its website; requiring the department to provide cost-share funding up to a specified amount for awarded grants, etc.
Title
Saltwater Intrusion Vulnerability Assessments
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2023-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1079 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee