FL S0734 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the uses of the Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes Trust Fund to include reimbursement of costs to the Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes for the administration and operation of the Homeowners' Association Act; providing a cause of action for a member against a community association manager or management firm under certain circumstances; revising circumstances under which members other than the developer are entitled to elect at least a majority of the board of directors of the homeowners' association, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners' Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-11-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H377 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720402Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback