FL H0377 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises uses of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, & Mobile Homes Trust Fund; increases damages to which member of homeowners' association is entitled for denial of access to official records; provides cause of action for member against community association manager or management firm; prohibits reimbursement to community association manager or management firm for certain fines; provides & revises reporting requirements; provides that fine may not become lien against parcel; revises provisions relating to election of officers; provides presuit mediation for election & recall disputes; provides for binding arbitration by DBPR for certain disputes between parcel owner & homeowners' association; requires DBPR to provide training & educational programs; authorizes DBPR to enforce & ensure compliance with Homeowners' Association Act & specified rules; provides DBPR with jurisdiction to investigate certain complaints; provides cause of action against developers by HOA or nondeveloper members of HOA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners' Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-10-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S734 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720402Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback