FL S0728 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a health insurance policy that covers opioid analgesic drug products may impose a prior authorization requirement for an abuse-deterrent opioid analgesic drug product only if the insurer imposes the same requirement for each opioid analgesic drug product without an abuse-deterrence labeling claim; prohibiting such health insurance policy from requiring use of an opioid analgesic drug product without an abuse-deterrence labeling claim before providing coverage for an abuse-deterrent opioid analgesic drug product, etc.
Title
Health Insurance Coverage for Opioids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 1021 |
2015-04-22 | House | Received |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (583640) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/09/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/23/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1021 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table