FL S0706 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-25 - CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
Pending: Senate Community Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 3:30 pm in 37 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring, instead of encouraging, local governments that adopt school concurrency to apply such concurrency to development on a districtwide basis; removing provisions addressing school concurrency on a less than districtwide basis; revising provisions specifying when school concurrency is satisfied; specifying that proportionate-share mitigation must be set aside and not spent if an improvement has not been identified, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Concurrency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-25SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2022-01-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-16SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Education; Rules
2021-10-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H851 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Now in Education & Employment Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633180Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback