FL S0704 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 783 (Ch. 2023-184)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 783 (Ch. 2023-184)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the types of delivery systems a pharmacist may order or use to dispense an emergency opioid antagonist; establishing the Statewide Council on Opioid Abatement within the Department of Children and Families, etc.
Title
Opioid Abatement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 783 (Ch. 2023-184) |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 783 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H783 (Similar To) 2023-06-02 - Chapter No. 2023-184
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 887 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |