FL S0690 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; replacing incorrect cross-references and citations; correcting grammatical, typographical, and like errors; removing inconsistencies, redundancies, and unnecessary repetition in the statutes; improving the clarity of the statutes and facilitating their correct interpretation; and confirming the restoration of provisions unintentionally omitted from republication in the acts of the Legislature during the amendatory process, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Chapter No. 2013-15 | |
2013-04-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-03-22 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-21 | House | Substituted for HB 7069 |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/13 |
2013-03-18 | House | Received |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-03-12 | House | In Messages |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2013-03-12 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/12/13 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7069 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 690 (Ch. 2013-15)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3246 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 340 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 4042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 5601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 939 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 940 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 941 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 942 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 945 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 2575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 71025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 980 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 2615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 0805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 840 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
344 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
349 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 3071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2433 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 3581 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0662 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00593 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
391 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 086 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 9416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
475 | 6235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
580 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
586 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 9910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 1825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
610 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 2815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8734 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9362 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 989 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 2325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
877 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |