FL S0666 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring state universities to waive specified fees for graduate students who meet a specified full-time equivalent appointment requirement, etc.
Title
State University Student Fee Waivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H769 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/666 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/666/BillText/Filed/HTML |