FL S0662 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the state attorney of a judicial circuit in which an offender was sentenced for a felony offense to petition the sentencing court to resentence the offender if the original sentence no longer advances the interests of justice; authorizing a court to grant or deny the petition; requiring a court to provide an opportunity for victims of the offender's crimes to present statements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resentencing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2021-03-10SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2021-03-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-02SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/02/21, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2021-01-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1459 (Same As) 2021-03-05 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
92130Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback