FL S0656 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring security background investigations for foreign language court interpreters and mediators, respectively; revising qualifications for parenting coordinators; modifying provisions authorizing justices or judges to purchase additional service credit in the Florida Retirement System under certain circumstances to conform to the revisions made to the mandatory judicial retirement age established in s. 8, Art. V of the State Constitution, etc.
Title
State Court System Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7081 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1764 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
H7081 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-98
S1186 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
H7081 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-98
S1186 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |