FL H7081 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires security background investigations for foreign language court interpreters & mediators; provides disqualification factors for parenting coordinators; authorizes disclosure of certain testimony or evidence in certain circumstances; provides immunity for certain persons; revises provisions relating to judicial retirement to conform to revisions to the mandatory retirement age; authorizes electronic records of criminal judgments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Court System Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#223 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-98
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 656
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseAmendment(s) adopted (846033)
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-17HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-10HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-10HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-03-15HouseIntroduced
2019-03-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S656 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
S1186 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
S1764 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
S7028 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25386Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921242Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback