FL S0616 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2014-217)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2014-217)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information held by the Department of Transportation, a county, a municipality, or an expressway authority for the purpose of paying, prepaying, or collecting tolls and associated administrative charges for the use of toll facilities; providing for application of the exemption; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Toll Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7007 (Ch. 2014-217) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7007 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/12/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/06/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/05/14, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7007 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-217