FL S0582 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing a provision that waives a tenant's defenses other than payment and entitles a landlord to an immediate default judgment for removal of a tenant if the tenant fails to take certain actions in an action by the landlord for possession of a dwelling unit, etc.
Title
Payments Made into the Registry of the Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6005 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1620 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1587 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1620 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1587 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/582 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/582/BillText/Filed/HTML |