FL H1587 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides requirements for rental agreements; removes option for landlord to deposit money into specified account; removes requirement money be paid into registry of court; authorizes filing of civil action & award of damages, court costs, & attorney fees; provides requirements for certain evictions; specifies what constitutes unreasonable rent increase.
Title
Residential Tenancies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1620 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H6005 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S582 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H6005 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S582 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 676 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 684 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1587 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1587/BillText/Filed/PDF |