FL S0580 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218), CS/CS/CS/HB 73 (Ch. 2013-188)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218), CS/CS/CS/HB 73 (Ch. 2013-188)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing grounds for disciplinary actions against community association managers; requiring associations to allow a member to use a portable device to make an electronic copy of the official records and prohibiting associations from charging a fee for such an electronic copy; requiring that a copy of an amendment to the governing documents be provided to the members within 30 days after it is recorded; providing additional circumstances for authorizing members to elect a majority of association board members, etc.
Title
Homeowners' Associations
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218), CS/CS/CS/HB 73 (Ch. 2013-188) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7119 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (269104, 660056, 788988, 825454) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/13, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/13, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/02/13, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7119 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-218, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 73 (Ch. 2013-188)
H0073 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-188, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7025 (Ch. 2013-159), CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218), CS/CS/SB 120 (Ch. 2013-122)
S0436 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 73 (Ch. 2013-188), CS/HB 7025 (Ch. 2013-159), CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218), CS/CS/SB 120 (Ch. 2013-122)
S0596 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 73 (Ch. 2013-188), CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218)
H0073 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-188, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7025 (Ch. 2013-159), CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218), CS/CS/SB 120 (Ch. 2013-122)
S0436 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 73 (Ch. 2013-188), CS/HB 7025 (Ch. 2013-159), CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218), CS/CS/SB 120 (Ch. 2013-122)
S0596 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 73 (Ch. 2013-188), CS/HB 7119 (Ch. 2013-218)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 436 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |