FL S0546 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Stop Fracking Act"; prohibiting persons from engaging in extreme well stimulation; prohibiting the Department of Environmental Protection from issuing permits that authorize extreme well stimulation; prohibiting the department from authorizing certain permitholders to engage in extreme well stimulation on or after a specified date; imposing a specified fine for violations, etc.
Title
Well Stimulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1575 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
377 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 2405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/546 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/546/BillText/Filed/HTML |