FL S0538 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Administration to divest investments, and prohibiting it from investment, in any institution or company or subsidiary of a company domiciled in the United States which does business in or with the government of Venezuela or its agencies or instrumentalities in violation of federal law; authorizing the Governor to waive such requirements under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
State and Local Governmental Relations with The Government of Venezuela
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 359 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted HB 359 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 01/29/18, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H279 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H359 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Chapter No. 2018-125
S70 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H359 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Chapter No. 2018-125
S70 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/538 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/538/BillText/Filed/HTML |