FL S0530 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain health care practitioners to provide a specified educational pamphlet to patients in an electronic format, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonopioid Alternatives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#276 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11 Chapter No. 2021-12
2021-05-07 Approved by Governor
2021-05-06 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-27SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2021-04-27SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-27SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (700035)
2021-04-23HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-23SenateIn returning messages
2021-04-23HousePassed as amended; YEAS 108, NAYS 0
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22HouseAmendment 700035 adopted
2021-04-22HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-22HouseSubstituted for HB 725
2021-04-19HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021)
2021-04-16HouseAmendment 700035 filed
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-13HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2021-04-08House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-04-08HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-18HouseIn Messages
2021-03-18SenateImmediately certified
2021-03-18SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2021-03-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-18SenateAmendment(s) adopted (951554)
2021-03-18SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-15SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/21
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-18SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-02-18SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-02-04SenateNow in Rules
2021-02-04SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Health Policy; Rules
2021-01-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H725 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 530

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Amendment/951554/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Analyses/2021s00530.pre.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Analyses/2021s00530.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Analyses/2021s00530.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Analyses/2021s00530.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Analyses/2021s00530.hms.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Vote/SenateVote_s00530__014.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Vote/HouseVote_s00530e1276.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Vote/SenateVote_s00530e1017.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Vote/2021-02-04%200830AM~S00530%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/530/Vote/2021-02-18%200900AM~S00530%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback